This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 03/09/2019 at 15:50:45 (UTC).

HILL ORTHOPEDIC CENTER, LLC vs. GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/08/2019 HILL ORTHOPEDIC CENTER, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Faye L Allen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************28-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Faye L Allen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HILL ORTHOPEDIC CENTER, LLC

MITCHELL DALTON AAO

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANS KENNON

Defendant Attorney

ROBIN JACKSON-BERNHARDT

 

Court Documents

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S DISCOVERY

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT

Summary of Proceedings

Summary of Proceedings

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY PIONNE CORBIN

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT S DISCOVERY

Notice to Appear

Notice to Appear; Comments: emailed to atty

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summary of Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • HEARING - Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY PIONNE CORBIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT S DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Appear; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Hans Kennon; Amount: -90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 90.00

    Read MoreRead Less