This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 03/06/2019 at 15:33:48 (UTC).

HIGH DEFINITION MOBILE MRI vs. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/05/2019 HIGH DEFINITION MOBILE MRI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Gisela T Laurent. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************30-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Gisela T Laurent

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HIGH DEFINITION MOBILE MRI

TANIA DESTINOBLES AAO

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAD BARR

Defendant Attorney

MADISON O'CONNELL

 

Court Documents

Motion to Stay

Motion to Stay

Motion

Motion; Comments: TO TRANSFER VENUE FOR FORUM NON CONVENIENS

Waiver

Waiver; Comments: OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ORDER

Motion to Invoke Florida Rules of Civil Procedure

Motion to Invoke Florida Rules of Civil Procedure

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Compliance

Notice of Compliance; Comments: WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: SERVICE OF PROCESS & ORIGINAL SUMMONS

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: Emailed to Atty

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Stay

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion; Comments: TO TRANSFER VENUE FOR FORUM NON CONVENIENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • HEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Waiver; Comments: OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Invoke Florida Rules of Civil Procedure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Compliance; Comments: WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Comments: SERVICE OF PROCESS & ORIGINAL SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: Emailed to Atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Law Office of Chad A. Barr; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less