This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/23/2021 at 00:53:17 (UTC).

HEATHER LEE VAUGHAN, AARON VAUGHANvs.TREVOR J GRUBER

Case Summary

On 08/28/2020 HEATHER LEE VAUGHAN, AARON VAUGHANvs TREVOR J GRUBER was filed as a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian F Duckworth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************45-O

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brian F Duckworth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HEATHER LEE VAUGHAN

AARON VAUGHAN

Defendant

TREVOR J GRUBER

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession Returned Posted

Writ of Possession Returned Posted

Writ of Possession Issued

Writ of Possession Issued; Comments: org & copy to pltf

Final Judgment

Final Judgment; Comments: see order for amount

Motion for Final Judgment

Motion for Final Judgment; Comments: sent fj to judge

Motion & Entry of Default on 5 Day Summons

Motion & Entry of Default on 5 Day Summons

Affidavit of Non Military Service

Affidavit of Non Military Service

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

Complaint

Complaint; Comments: w/attachments

Summons Issued

Summons Issued; Comments: 20 day : orig. sheriff

Summons Issued 5 Day

Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: orig. sheriff

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/07/2020
View Court Documents

DocketWrit of Possession Returned Posted

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2020
View Court Documents

DocketWrit of Possession Issued; Comments: org & copy to pltf

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2020
View Court Documents

DocketFinal Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2020
View Court Documents

DocketFinal Judgment; Comments: see order for amount

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2020
View Court Documents

DocketMotion for Final Judgment; Comments: sent fj to judge

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2020
View Court Documents

DocketMotion & Entry of Default on 5 Day Summons

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2020
View Court Documents

DocketAffidavit of Non Military Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/10/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Returned Served

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/10/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Returned Served

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2020

FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: VAUGHAN, HEATHER LEE; Amount: -205.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2020

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 20.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2020

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued; Comments: 20 day : orig. sheriff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued 5 Day; Comments: orig. sheriff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCertificate of Mailing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2020
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint; Comments: w/attachments

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2020

DocketCase Initiated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less