This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 11/22/2020 at 15:57:05 (UTC).

HEALTHQUEST CHIROPRACTIC AND REHABILITATION INC. vs. GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 HEALTHQUEST CHIROPRACTIC AND REHABILITATION INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Gisela T Laurent. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************11-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Gisela T Laurent

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HEALTHQUEST CHIROPRACTIC AND REHABILITATION INC.

PERISHA JOHNSON AAO

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JESSICA PICKERAL

Defendant Attorney

ROGER JOHNSON

 

Court Documents

Answer

Answer; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: , DISCLOSURE, AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories; Comments: FIRST TO PLAINTIFF

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: FIRST TO PLAINTIFF

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: FIRST

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DISCLOSURE, AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: per Administrative Order 2009-12-02.

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: , DISCLOSURE, AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories; Comments: FIRST TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: FIRST TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Comments: FIRST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DISCLOSURE, AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: SDUTI- per Admin order 2009-12-02, emailed sent to attorney. Missing ADDENDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Jessica Pickeral; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less