This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 02/25/2022 at 18:02:39 (UTC).

HEALTH DIAGNOSTICS OF ORLANDO LLC vs. FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/17/2021 HEALTH DIAGNOSTICS OF ORLANDO LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael Deen and Eric H DuBois. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************45-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Michael Deen

Eric H DuBois

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HEALTH DIAGNOSTICS OF ORLANDO LLC

SUSAN WILLIAMS ELLZEY AAO

STAND-UP MRI OF ORLANDO DBA

Defendant

FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANS KENNON

Defendant Attorneys

BRETT CAREY

JASON TENENBAUM

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: Electronic Delivery 12/16/21 Fireman's Fund Insurance Company

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENTS ON D

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT S DISCOVERY REQUESTS

Petition or Motion for Substitution of Counsel

Petition or Motion for Substitution of Counsel

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY REQUESTS

Order on Motion for Substitution of Counsel

Order on Motion for Substitution of Counsel

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Motion for Substitution of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY REQUESTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition or Motion for Substitution of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT S DISCOVERY REQUESTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENTS ON D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: Electronic Delivery 12/16/21 Fireman's Fund Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: (FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE CO)THE NAME OF DEFENDANT TO BE SERVED MUST BE LISTED EXACTLY AS IT APPEARS ON THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Hans Kennon; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HEALTH DIAGNOSTICS OF ORLANDO, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Firemans Fund Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAREY , BRETT MATTHEW

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tenenbaum, Jason, ESQ