Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/12/2019 at 15:38:12 (UTC).

HARMOHINDER DHILLON vs. TENEISHA K NOLLEY

Case Summary

On 12/14/2018 HARMOHINDER DHILLON filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TENEISHA K NOLLEY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are David P Johnson and Evellen H Jewett. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************37-O

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

David P Johnson

Evellen H Jewett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARMOHINDER DHILLON

Defendant

TENEISHA K NOLLEY

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession Returned Posted

Writ of Possession Returned Posted

Order Denying Stay on Writ of Possession

Order Denying Stay on Writ of Possession

Motion to Stay

Motion to Stay; Comments: WRIT OF POSSESSION (EMAIL SENT TO JA/ JUDGE)

Final Judgment

Final Judgment

Writ of Possession Issued

Writ of Possession Issued; Comments: org & copy to pltf

Answer

Answer; Comments: SENT TO JUDGE

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

Complaint

Complaint

Summons Issued 5 Day

Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: ALL HANDED TO PLTF

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing

Owners Authorization

Owners Authorization

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession Returned Posted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Denying Stay on Writ of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Stay; Comments: WRIT OF POSSESSION (EMAIL SENT TO JA/ JUDGE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession Issued; Comments: org & copy to pltf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer; Comments: SENT TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: ALL HANDED TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Owners Authorization

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: DHILLON, HARMOHINDER; Amount: -1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: DHILLON, HARMOHINDER; Amount: -195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less