This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 07/13/2021 at 16:03:51 (UTC).

HARDY, BROOKE Rvs.CARLILE, JEANNINE J

Case Summary

On 05/14/2021 HARDY, BROOKE Rvs CARLILE, JEANNINE J was filed as a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Kevin B. Weiss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************50-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Kevin B. Weiss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROOKE R HARDY

Defendant

JEANNINE J CARLILE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEE DANI

Defendant Attorney

DANA ANDERSON

 

Court Documents

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF PROCESS SERVER AS TO JEANINE J. CARLILE

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E-Mailed to Atty.

Order Approving Streamlined Case Management Plan

Order Approving Streamlined Case Management Plan

Lis Pendens

Lis Pendens

Notice

Notice; Comments: PLAINTIFFS ESTIMATE OF THE VALUE OF THE CLAIM

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF PROCESS SERVER AS TO JEANINE J. CARLILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E-Mailed to Atty.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Stephen D. Korshak; Amount: -410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Comments: PLAINTIFFS ESTIMATE OF THE VALUE OF THE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DANA ANDERSON