This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 10/26/2021 at 15:38:12 (UTC).

HAMPTONS REMODELING SERVICES LLCvs.JMB DRYWALL OF FLORIDA LLC, AILERON WINTER PARK LLC, US SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 HAMPTONS REMODELING SERVICES LLCvs JMB DRYWALL OF FLORIDA LLC, AILERON WINTER PARK LLC, US SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael Deen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************82-O

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Michael Deen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAMPTONS REMODELING SERVICES LLC

Defendants

JMB DRYWALL OF FLORIDA LLC

AILERON WINTER PARK LLC

US SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHRISTOPHER JOHNSON

 

Court Documents

Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel

Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel; Comments: (Amended)

Motion to Withdraw

Motion to Withdraw; Comments: AS COUNSEL

Motion to Withdraw

Motion to Withdraw

Correspondence

Correspondence

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Correspondence

Correspondence

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel; Comments: (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Withdraw; Comments: AS COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Withdraw

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: Per Admin Order No. 2021-04, a Standing Case Management Plan/Order for Streamlined or General civil cases must be submitted before summonses can be issued. Please resubmit the proposed summons along with the Case management Order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Trinidad Law Group, PLLC; Amount: -430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U S Specialty Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHRISTOPHER JOHNSON