This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/01/2019 at 15:34:24 (UTC).

HAIRSTON, COLLETTEvs.WAL MART STORES EAST LP

Case Summary

On 12/31/2018 HAIRSTON, COLLETTEvs WAL MART STORES EAST LP was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Heather L Higbee and Patricia L Strowbridge. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************98-O

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Heather L Higbee

Patricia L Strowbridge

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLLETTE HAIRSTON

Defendants

WALMART STORES INC

WAL MART STORES EAST LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT DUNAWAY

Defendant Attorney

MICHELE MORALES

 

Court Documents

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: TO PLAINTIFF S AMENDED COMPLAINT

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: FIRST

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: TO PLAINTIFF

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: OF GENERAL PERSONAL INJURY TO PLAINTIFF

Notice of Compliance

Notice of Compliance; Comments: WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

Complaint

Complaint

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, WAL-MART STORES, INC.

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, WAL-MART STORES, INC.

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, WAL-MART STORES, INC

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: JURY TRIAL

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: TO PLAINTIFF S AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce; Comments: FIRST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Comments: TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: OF GENERAL PERSONAL INJURY TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Compliance; Comments: WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, WAL-MART STORES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, WAL-MART STORES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, WAL-MART STORES, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Dan Newlin & Partners; Amount: -410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less