This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 11/23/2020 at 15:56:44 (UTC).

GUY YVES PELCHAT DC PA vs. GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 GUY YVES PELCHAT DC PA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Evellen H Jewett. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************83-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Evellen H Jewett

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EPHRAIM JOHNSON AAO

GUY YVES PELCHAT DC PA

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY GUDIN

Defendant Attorney

JENNELL LOPER

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DISCLOSURE, AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY,

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

Addendum to

Addendum to

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim; Comments: Geico General Insurance Company

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DISCLOSURE, AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Marc Salpeter; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Comments: Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less