This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/03/2019 at 15:32:31 (UTC).

GULF ATLANTIC INDUSTRIES OF AMERICA DISASTER RELIEvs.FLORIDA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 GULF ATLANTIC INDUSTRIES OF AMERICA DISASTER RELIEvs FLORIDA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Contract - Insurance lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Keith A Carsten. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************46-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Keith A Carsten

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ERIL PRESTIME AKA

GULF ATLANTIC INDUSTRIES OF AMERICA DISASTER RELIE

ERIL PRESTIME AAO

Defendant

FLORIDA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAITLIN POLLY

Defendant Attorney

GREGORY PRUSAK

 

Court Documents

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: JURY TRIAL

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Complaint

Complaint

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: STEVEN M BUSH; Amount: -410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less