This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 01/26/2019 at 03:50:49 (UTC).

GUILLERMO, JUAN CARLOS, JR vs. In Re: Name Change

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 GUILLERMO, JUAN CARLOS, JR filed an Other - Name Change lawsuit against In Re Name Change. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan S Apte. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************95-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Alan S Apte

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JUAN CARLOS GUILLERMO JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CAMILLE SEBRETH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2019
  • Court Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Disposition Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • HEARING - Name Change - Apte, Alan S (Actual: Apte, Alan S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Application for Determining Indigent Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Name Change Form Provided For Vital Statistics

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Application for Insolvency and Indigency For Clerk Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Application for Insolvency and Indigency For Clerk Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Copy of Drivers License

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Birth Certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: GUILLERMO, JUAN CARLOS, JR; Amount: -33.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 33.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: -412.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 412.50

    Read MoreRead Less