This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 02/21/2021 at 23:50:20 (UTC).

GROSS , NINAvs.MF WINTER PARK LLC

Case Summary

On 08/11/2020 GROSS , NINAvs MF WINTER PARK LLC was filed as a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Lisa T. Munyon and Reginald K Whitehead. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************54-O

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Lisa T. Munyon

Reginald K Whitehead

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NINA GROSS

THE ESTATE OF DIANE D BERRY AKA

THE ESTATE OF DIANE D BERRY PREP

Defendants

MF WINTER PARK LLC

THE REHABILITATION CENTER OF WINTER PARK AKA

THE REHABILITATION CENTER OF WINTER PARK DBA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM DEAN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement

Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement

Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: mailed to atty (sase)

Complaint

Complaint

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Proposal for Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Proposal for Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: mailed to atty (sase)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: DEAN, WILLIAM ANDREW, Esquire; Amount: -10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: SUMMONS FEE NOT PAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: William Dean; Amount: -400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE REHABILITATION CENTER OF WINTER PARK AKA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAM DEAN