This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 05/17/2019 at 15:34:42 (UTC).

GROSS, MORRIS M vs. FLORIDA HOSPITAL MEDICAL GROUP INCet al.

Case Summary

On 03/18/2019 GROSS, MORRIS M filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against FLORIDA HOSPITAL MEDICAL GROUP INC. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Luis F Calderon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************04-O

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Luis F Calderon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MORRIS M GROSS

THE ESTATE OF JENNIELYN GROSS PREP

Defendants

ATLANTIC PODIATRY ASSOCIATES DPM PA

ANDREW GREEN DPM

RADIOLOGY SPECIALISTS OF FLORIDA DBA

FLORIDA HOSPITAL MEDICAL GROUP INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT MCLEOD

Defendant Attorney

CRAIG FOELS

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Correspondence

Correspondence

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Complaint

Complaint

Summons Returned Unserved

Summons Returned Unserved; Comments: ATLANTIC PODIATRY ASSOCIATES DPM PA

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Alias Summons Issued

Alias Summons Issued

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS OF DEFENDANT ATLANTIC PODIATRY ASSOCIATES DPM PA

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Comments: plaintiff's reply to the affirmative defenses of defendant florida hospital medical group, inc. d/b/a/ radiology specialist of florida

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses; Comments: plaintiff's reply to the affirmative defenses of defendant florida hospital medical group, inc. d/b/a/ radiology specialist of florida

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS OF DEFENDANT ATLANTIC PODIATRY ASSOCIATES DPM PA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAlias Summons Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved; Comments: ATLANTIC PODIATRY ASSOCIATES DPM PA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketDescription: Payment; Payer: MCLEOD, ROBERT LESTER; Amount: -10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketDescription: Payment; Payer: Robert L. McLeod, II; Amount: -430.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 430.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less