This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 06/11/2019 at 03:46:29 (UTC).

GREEN, DONNA vs. GREEN, MICHAEL

Case Summary

On 05/18/2019 GREEN, DONNA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GREEN, MICHAEL. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Tanya Davis Wilson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************78-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Tanya Davis Wilson

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DONNA GREEN

Respondent

MICHAEL GREEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

GEORGE CRANTON

KENNETH KOMARA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2019
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Memorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Notice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Notice of Filing Child Support Guideline Worksheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Notice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Financial Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Financial Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2019
  • Notice of Social Security

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2019
  • Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2019
  • Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2019
  • Notice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2019
  • Cover Sheet for Family Court Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2019
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2019
  • Amended Administrative Temporary Order Provided to Customer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Komara and Cranton, P.A.; Amount: -408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRANTON, GEORGE D ESQ

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOMARA, KENNETH J