Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/14/2021 at 11:21:49 (UTC).

GOOD CARE REHAB AND WELLNESS INC vs.PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/02/2020 GOOD CARE REHAB AND WELLNESS INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth J Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************89-O

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth J Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ONIEL MONEUS AAO

GOOD CARE REHAB AND WELLNESS INC

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT MORRIS

Defendant Attorney

REBECCA BENCH

 

Court Documents

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Privilege Log

Privilege Log

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Amended Answer

Amended Answer; Comments: , Affirmative Defenses, and Demand for Jury Trial

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY - PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Stipulation

Stipulation; Comments: PLAINTIFF S NOTICE OF STIPULATION TO ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: to respond to plaintiff's complaint and initial discovery served with complaint.

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med 69976928; Comments: AND NOTICE OF E-MAIL DESIGNATION

Interrogatories

Interrogatories 69980439

Request to Produce

Request to Produce 69980440

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions 69980441

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed to atty

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPrivilege Log

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Answer; Comments: , Affirmative Defenses, and Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY - PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation; Comments: PLAINTIFF S NOTICE OF STIPULATION TO ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: to respond to plaintiff's complaint and initial discovery served with complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Civil; Location: Room 130.02 on the 1st Floor Pre-Trial Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNot of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med; Comments: AND NOTICE OF E-MAIL DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Eiffert Associates PA; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GOOD CARE REHAB & WELLNESS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant