This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/11/2021 at 21:32:05 (UTC).

GONZALEZ, LUIS JAVIER vs. DARRIGO, YULEYDI

Case Summary

On 06/16/2020 GONZALEZ, LUIS JAVIER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DARRIGO, YULEYDI. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Diana M. Tennis. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************58-O

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Diana M. Tennis

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LUIS JAVIER GONZALEZ

Respondent

YULEYDI DARRIGO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketDisposition Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketMotion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketAffidavit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: GONZALEZ, LUIS JAVIER; Amount: -408.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 10.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: -14.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 14.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 397.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketFinancial Affidavit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketFinancial Affidavit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Social Security

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Social Security

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketCopy of Drivers License

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketPetition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketAmended Administrative Temporary Order Provided to Customer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less