This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/13/2023 at 15:36:13 (UTC).

GONZALEZ, DENISvs.RED LOBSTER HOSPITALITY LLC

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 GONZALEZ, DENISvs RED LOBSTER HOSPITALITY LLC was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Margaret H Schreiber. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************49-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Margaret H Schreiber

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DENIS GONZALEZ

Defendants

RED LOBSTER HOSPITALITY LLC

RED LOBSTER DBA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARY BOYNTON

Defendant Attorney

LINDSEY FREEMAN

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Unavailability

Notice of Unavailability

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: RED LOBSTER HOSPITALITY

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: RED LOBSTER HOSPITALITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Unavailability

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: BOYNTON, GARY JOHN; Amount: -410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less