This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 08/07/2022 at 15:34:35 (UTC).

GONZALEZ, ANDREA vs. BRUCE, MELANIEet al.

Case Summary

On 06/08/2022 GONZALEZ, ANDREA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BRUCE, MELANIE. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise Kim Beamer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************61-O

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Denise Kim Beamer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDREA GONZALEZ

Defendants

MELANIE BRUCE

HUBBELL POWER SYSTEMS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JUSTIN BLEAKLEY

Defendant Attorneys

JENNIFER BROOKS

FRANK MADIA

 

Court Documents

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Production of Non-Party

Notice of Production of Non-Party

Order Enlargement and Extension of Time

Order Enlargement and Extension of Time; Comments: to Respond to Pltfs Discovery Request

Letter

Letter

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT MELANIE BRUCE

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, HUBBELL POWER SYSTEMS, INC

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: To Defendant Melanie Bruce

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Production of Non-Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Enlargement and Extension of Time; Comments: to Respond to Pltfs Discovery Request

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Comments: TO DEFENDANT MELANIE BRUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, HUBBELL POWER SYSTEMS, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: To Defendant Melanie Bruce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hubbell Power Systems Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRANK MADIA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROOKS , JENNIFER