This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 08/17/2021 at 15:40:53 (UTC).

GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USAvs.PHUOC TRUONG

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USAvs PHUOC TRUONG was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth J Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************09-O

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth J Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA

Defendant

PHUOC TRUONG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHRISTINA CHARLET

Defendant Attorney

KATERYNA VYKHODETS

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: PHUOC TRUONG

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: to file responsive pleading

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: to file responsive pleading

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: PHUOC TRUONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Christina N. Charlet; Amount: -410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KATERYNA VYKHODETS