This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 02/22/2022 at 04:04:54 (UTC).

GIFFORD, JESSICA K et al. vs. MATTAMY ORLANDO LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 07/22/2021 GIFFORD, JESSICA K filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against MATTAMY ORLANDO LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise Kim Beamer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************25-O

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Denise Kim Beamer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JESSICA K GIFFORD

MARK ANTHONY GIFFORD

Defendants

MATTAMY ORLANDO LLC

ADVANCED WRAPPING AND CONCRETE OF CENTRAL FLORIDA

ALLIANCE BUILDING MATERIAL SUPPLY INC

JM PLASTERING INC

L PELLINEN CONSTRUCTION

SUPERIOR COATING SYSTEMS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID GREENE

Defendant Attorneys

CHARLES HARPER

TIMOTHY MOORHEAD

DOUGLAS WALL

ANDREW MARSHALL

 

Court Documents

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

Letter

Letter

Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement

Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement

Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement

Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Order Setting Aside

Order Setting Aside; Comments: Default as to Defendant, JM Plastering Inc.

Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel

Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel

Joint Stipulation

Joint Stipulation

Order Enlargement and Extension of Time

Order Enlargement and Extension of Time

Letter

Letter

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Motion to Withdraw

Motion to Withdraw; Comments: AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT, L. PELLINEN CONSTRUCTION, INC

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Default Entered by the Clerk

Default Entered by the Clerk; Comments: emailed to attorney

Default Entered by the Clerk

Default Entered by the Clerk; Comments: emailed to attorney

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Proposal for Settlement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Proposal for Settlement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Setting Aside; Comments: Default as to Defendant, JM Plastering Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Enlargement and Extension of Time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: Per Admin Order No. 2021-04, a Standing Case Management Plan/Order for Streamlined or General civil cases must be submitted at time of filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Woods Trial Law; Amount: -460.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 460.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less