This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/12/2023 at 15:32:26 (UTC).

GETLEY, CHRISTOPHERet al. vs. SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 GETLEY, CHRISTOPHER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Margaret H Schreiber. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************95-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Margaret H Schreiber

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHRISTOPHER GETLEY

DEBORAH WILSON

Defendant

SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JULIANNA WEISS

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Notice of Service

Notice of Service; Comments: ATTACHED NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: To Respond to Complaint

Notice

Notice; Comments: OF REMOVAL TO CLERK OF STATE COURT

Notice

Notice; Comments: OF REMOVAL TO OPPOSING COUNSEL

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Comments: OF REMOVAL TO OPPOSING COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Comments: OF REMOVAL TO CLERK OF STATE COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: To Respond to Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service; Comments: ATTACHED NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: The Law Office of Carrington Jones; Amount: -410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less