This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 01/23/2022 at 15:41:17 (UTC).

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANYvs.CIARA SHANTELL FANEITTY, PEDRO JAVIER COLON

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANYvs CIARA SHANTELL FANEITTY, PEDRO JAVIER COLON was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth J Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************06-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth J Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

KEVIN ANDREW WALKER SUB

Defendants

CIARA SHANTELL FANEITTY

PEDRO JAVIER COLON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JENNIFER REISS

Defendant Attorney

AYDA KAPSALES

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Return of Service of Summons

Return of Service of Summons; Comments: CIARA SHANTELL FANEITTY

Return of Service of Summons

Return of Service of Summons; Comments: PEDRO JAVIER COLON

Motion for Default

Motion for Default; Comments: w/ proposed default

Affidavit of Non Military Service

Affidavit of Non Military Service

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Default Entered by the Clerk

Default Entered by the Clerk; Comments: em atty

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Entered by the Clerk; Comments: em atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Non Military Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default; Comments: w/ proposed default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Summons; Comments: PEDRO JAVIER COLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Summons; Comments: CIARA SHANTELL FANEITTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Jennifer Reiss; Amount: -420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant