Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 04/16/2021 at 16:36:11 (UTC).

GDC VERDE MASTER LLCvs.JUDE GONZAL

Case Summary

On 03/23/2021 GDC VERDE MASTER LLCvs JUDE GONZAL was filed as a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian F Duckworth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************91-O

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brian F Duckworth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GDC VERDE MASTER LLC

NORA APARTMENTS DBA

Defendant

JUDE GONZAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRIAN WOLK

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

Motion for Default

Motion for Default

Verification of Claim & Non-Military Service

Verification of Claim & Non-Military Service

Affidavit of Non Military Service

Affidavit of Non Military Service

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: POSTED AS TO JUDE GONZAL

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing

Complaint

Complaint

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Email sent to attorney

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: Unable to Issue Default - Deft Answer filed on 4/7/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVerification of Claim & Non-Military Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Non Military Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: POSTED AS TO JUDE GONZAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: WOLK, BRIAN PETER; Amount: -195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Email sent to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GDC VERDE MASTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOLK, BRIAN