This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 06/25/2022 at 15:32:22 (UTC).

GARCIA, ALICIA vs. LOCKE, BARBARA NANCY

Case Summary

On 04/26/2022 GARCIA, ALICIA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LOCKE, BARBARA NANCY. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise Kim Beamer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************59-O

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Denise Kim Beamer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALICIA GARCIA

Defendant

BARBARA NANCY LOCKE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ADY GOSS

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Letter

Letter

Order Appointing Process Server

Order Appointing Process Server

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing Process Server

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketMotion to Appoint for Service of Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: Need Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Ady A. Goss; Amount: -410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADY GOSS