Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 06/26/2021 at 15:33:58 (UTC).

FRANCO RAMOS, KRYSTAL MARIE vs. HATCH, GREG

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 FRANCO RAMOS, KRYSTAL MARIE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HATCH, GREG. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Reginald K Whitehead. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************63-O

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Reginald K Whitehead

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KRYSTAL MARIE FRANCO RAMOS

Defendant

GREG HATCH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARLOS DIEZ-ARGUELLES

Defendant Attorney

THOMAS KNIGHT

 

Court Documents

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Motion to Consolidate

Motion to Consolidate

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Email sent to attorney

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Consolidate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Email sent to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: C Diez-Arguelles; Amount: -410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMAS KNIGHT