This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 06/26/2018 at 07:42:03 (UTC).

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC vs. DONALD K DAVIS, BOAT RV AND AUTO STORAGE OF W ORANGE LLC

Case Summary

On 04/12/2018 FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DONALD K DAVIS, BOAT RV AND AUTO STORAGE OF W ORANGE LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Faye L Allen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************50-O

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Faye L Allen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

Defendants

BOAT RV AND AUTO STORAGE OF W ORANGE LLC

DONALD K DAVIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL INGINO

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint

Affidavit

Affidavit; Comments: OF FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

Motion for Order

Motion for Order; Comments: OF PREJUDGMENT WRIT OF REPLEVIN; FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Order for Writ

Order for Writ; Comments: of replevin

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: DONALD K DAVIS

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: BOB MCKINLEY

Answer

Answer

Response

Response; Comments: Copy to judge

Writ of Replevin Issued

Writ of Replevin Issued; Comments: ORIG+ COPY MAILED TO ATTY SASE

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comments: 6/26/18 @ 11:15 Am

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/26/2018

DocketHEARING - Motion - Allen, Faye L

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/19/2018
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Hearing; Comments: 6/26/18 @ 11:15 Am

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/21/2018
View Court Documents

DocketWrit of Replevin Issued; Comments: ORIG+ COPY MAILED TO ATTY SASE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2018
View Court Documents

DocketResponse; Comments: Copy to judge

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2018
View Court Documents

DocketAnswer

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2018
View Court Documents

DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: BOB MCKINLEY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/14/2018
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: DONALD K DAVIS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/07/2018
View Court Documents

DocketOrder for Writ; Comments: of replevin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/23/2018
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/23/2018
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2018
View Court Documents

DocketMotion for Order; Comments: OF PREJUDGMENT WRIT OF REPLEVIN; FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2018
View Court Documents

DocketAffidavit; Comments: OF FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2018
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2018

DocketCase Initiated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2018

DocketDescription: Payment; Payer: INGINO, MICHAEL JAMES, Esquire; Amount: -8.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2018

DocketDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 8.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2018

DocketDescription: Payment; Payer: Michael J Ingino; Amount: -405.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2018

DocketDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 405.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less