This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 09/10/2022 at 16:22:28 (UTC).

FLORIDAS FINEST AUTO GLASS LLCvs.INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/12/2022 FLORIDAS FINEST AUTO GLASS LLCvs INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric H DuBois. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************33-O

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Eric H DuBois

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FLORIDAS FINEST AUTO GLASS LLC

RAPHAEL PEREZ AAO

Defendant

INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IMRAN MALIK

Defendant Attorney

STEPHANIE FERNANDEZ

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: ADDENDUM

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Complaint

Complaint

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: em atty

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss; Comments: OR ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION TO STAY AND COMPEL APPRAISAL

Order Granting Motion to Compel

Order Granting Motion to Compel; Comments: Appraisal & Denying Motion to Dismiss

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granting Motion to Compel; Comments: Appraisal & Denying Motion to Dismiss

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Comments: OR ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION TO STAY AND COMPEL APPRAISAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: em atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Imran Malik; Amount: -185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Comments: ADDENDUM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Florida's Finest Auto Glass, Llc A/A/O Corevil Cabrera is a litigant

Latest cases where Infinity Auto Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEPHANIE FERNANDEZ