This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 09/10/2022 at 16:22:35 (UTC).

FLORIDAS FINEST AUTO GLASS LLC vs.BRISTOL WEST INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/12/2022 FLORIDAS FINEST AUTO GLASS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BRISTOL WEST INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy J Carter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************34-O

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Amy J Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FLORIDAS FINEST AUTO GLASS LLC

AMY FELOR AAO

Defendant

BRISTOL WEST INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IMRAN MALIK

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: ADDENDUM

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Complaint

Complaint

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: em atty

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss; Comments: OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO STAY LITIGATION AND ENFORCE APPRAISAL

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: Exhibits w/ attachment

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: Exhibits w/ attachment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Comments: OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO STAY LITIGATION AND ENFORCE APPRAISAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: em atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Imran Malik; Amount: -185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Comments: ADDENDUM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Florida's Finest Auto Glass, Llc A/A/O Corevil Cabrera is a litigant

Latest cases where BRISTOL WEST INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Malik, Imran E