This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 11/22/2020 at 16:09:48 (UTC).

FLORIDA SPINE ORTHOPEDICS vs. GEICO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 FLORIDA SPINE ORTHOPEDICS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Gisela T Laurent. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************84-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Gisela T Laurent

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALEXANDER MARINO AAO

FLORIDA SPINE ORTHOPEDICS

Defendant

GEICO INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDUARDO RODRIGUEZ

Defendant Attorney

JOHN MCMILLEN

 

Court Documents

Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel; Comments: RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel; Comments: TO DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED

Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel; Comments: RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF S INTERROGATORIES

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Memorandum

Memorandum

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: CIVIL COVER SHEET

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel; Comments: RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel; Comments: TO DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel; Comments: RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF S INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Pardy and Rodriguez, P.A.; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less