This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 11/22/2020 at 15:58:12 (UTC).

FLORIDA SPINE AND ORTHOPEDICS INC vs. ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 FLORIDA SPINE AND ORTHOPEDICS INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth J Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************21-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth J Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FLORIDA SPINE AND ORTHOPEDICS INC

JARIO MERCHAN AAO

Defendant

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAD BARR

Defendant Attorney

ANTHONY PARRINO

 

Court Documents

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: DEFT

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med; Comments: and Designation of Email Addresses

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: NO ATTACHMENT

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: ADDENDUM

Letter

Letter

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNot of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med; Comments: and Designation of Email Addresses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: NO ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Chad Barr; Amount: -65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Comments: ADDENDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less