Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 05/14/2021 at 16:04:55 (UTC).

FLORIDA INJURY MEDICAL CENTERS INC vs. PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 FLORIDA INJURY MEDICAL CENTERS INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Tina L Caraballo and Michael Deen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************10-O

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Tina L Caraballo

Michael Deen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FLORIDA INJURY MEDICAL CENTERS INC A/A/O KAREN HALE

FLORIDA INJURY MEDICAL CENTERS INC

KAREN HALE AAO

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JESSICA PICKERAL

Defendant Attorney

BRANDON ETTELMAN

 

Court Documents

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL- DEFT

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND NOTICE OF E-MAIL DESIGNATION- PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: NOTICE OF E-MAIL DESIGNATION

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Complaint

Complaint

Summons Issued

Summons Issued; Comments: emailed to attorney

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: Addendum

Notice of Compliance

Notice of Compliance; Comments: and Designation of Email Address(es)

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: (First)

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL- DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND NOTICE OF E-MAIL DESIGNATION- PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: NOTICE OF E-MAIL DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued; Comments: emailed to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Jessica Pickeral; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Comments: Addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Compliance; Comments: and Designation of Email Address(es)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: (First)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLORIDA INJURY MEDICAL CENTERS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JESSICA PICKERAL