This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/03/2019 at 15:31:59 (UTC).

FIRST EQUITY MORTGAGE BANKERS INC vs. GILBERT, WILLIE Cet al.

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 FIRST EQUITY MORTGAGE BANKERS INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against GILBERT, WILLIE C. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Lisa T Munyon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************34-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Lisa T Munyon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST EQUITY MORTGAGE BANKERS INC

Defendants

ORLANDO HEALTH INC

FA MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS INC

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CYNTHIA TRIM GILBERT

ORANGE COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WILLIE C GILBERT

WILLIE C GILBERT

CYNTHIA TRIM GILBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JASON VANSLETTE

Defendant Attorney

HUGH SHAFRITZ

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Motion to Amend

Motion to Amend; Comments: plaintiff initial compliant by interlineation by First Equity Mortgage Bankers, Inc

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Answer

Answer; Comments: TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

Summons Returned Unserved

Summons Returned Unserved; Comments: CYNTHIA TRIM GILBERT

Summons Returned Unserved

Summons Returned Unserved; Comments: UNKNOWN TENANT #2

Value of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

Value of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: F.A. MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS, INC. C/O HUGH SHAFRITZ, REGISTERED AGENT

Complaint

Complaint

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Form "A"

Form "A"

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Affidavit of Non-Service

Affidavit of Non-Service; Comments: ORANGE COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMISSIONERS

Answer

Answer; Comments: and MOTION TO PARTICIPATE IN SURPLUS PROCEEDS

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: ORLANDO HEALTH INC

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer; Comments: TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Non-Service; Comments: UKN TENANT #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned Unserved; Comments: UNKNOWN TENANT #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Amend; Comments: plaintiff initial compliant by interlineation by First Equity Mortgage Bankers, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Non-Service; Comments: ORANGE COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMISSIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned Served; Comments: F.A. MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS, INC. C/O HUGH SHAFRITZ, REGISTERED AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Service; Comments: ORLANDO HEALTH INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned Unserved; Comments: CYNTHIA TRIM GILBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer; Comments: and MOTION TO PARTICIPATE IN SURPLUS PROCEEDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Form "A"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Value of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Lis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Reena Sanders; Amount: -502.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 502.50

    Read MoreRead Less