This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/02/2019 at 15:42:31 (UTC).

FAKHOURY MEDICAL AND CHIROPRACTIC CENTER PLLC vs. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/04/2018 FAKHOURY MEDICAL AND CHIROPRACTIC CENTER PLLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are David P Johnson and Evellen H Jewett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************66-O

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

David P Johnson

Evellen H Jewett

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FAKHOURY MEDICAL AND CHIROPRACTIC CENTER PLLC

JEFF SCHEITLIN AAO

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TODD LANDAU

Defendant Attorney

JEFFREY REGENSTREIF

 

Court Documents

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Change of Address; Comments: FIRM MAILING

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY ELECTRONIC SERVICE E-MAIL ADDRESS

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

Notice of Service

Notice of Service; Comments: OF PLAINTIFF S SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES REGARDING REASONABLENESS

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: SUPPLEMENTAL REGARDING REASONABLENESS

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: PLAINTIFF S FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: SUPPLEMENTAL REGARDING UNDERWRITING

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: SUPPLEMENTAL REGARDING FEE SCHEDULE

Notice of Compliance

Notice of Compliance; Comments: WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY LYNETTE COLEMAN

Notice to Appear

Notice to Appear; Comments: emailed to atty

Complaint

Complaint

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address; Comments: FIRM MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Comments: DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY ELECTRONIC SERVICE E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service; Comments: OF PLAINTIFF S SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES REGARDING REASONABLENESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce; Comments: SUPPLEMENTAL REGARDING REASONABLENESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: PLAINTIFF S FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce; Comments: SUPPLEMENTAL REGARDING UNDERWRITING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Comments: SUPPLEMENTAL REGARDING FEE SCHEDULE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • HEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Compliance; Comments: WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY LYNETTE COLEMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Appear; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Landau & Associates, P.A.; Amount: -65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less