This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 11/22/2020 at 16:07:38 (UTC).

EVETTE DUNNvs.DIANA NAZAIRO

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 EVETTE DUNNvs DIANA NAZAIRO was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Gisela T Laurent. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************68-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Gisela T Laurent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EVETTE DUNN

Defendants

DIANA NAZAIRO

BOCA CLUB APARTMENT DBA

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

Notice to Appear Returned Served

Notice to Appear Returned Served

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: ALL HANDED TO PLAINTIFF

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2021
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial; Location: Room 130.02 on the 1st Floor Pre-Trial Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Returned Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: DUNN, EVETTE; Amount: -93.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 13.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: ALL HANDED TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less