This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 02/28/2021 at 02:29:00 (UTC).

ESTRADA, IRAIDA vs. MCNAB, DONALD PETERet al.

Case Summary

On 11/16/2020 ESTRADA, IRAIDA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MCNAB, DONALD PETER. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Chad K Alvaro and Vincent Falcone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************67-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Chad K Alvaro

Vincent Falcone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IRAIDA ESTRADA

Defendants

ALLIED UNIVERSAL TOPCO, LLC

DONALD PETER MCNAB

US SECURITY ASSOCAITES INC AKA

ALLIED UNIVERSAL TOPCO LLC DBA US SECURITY ASS INC

UNIVERSAL PROTECTION SERVICE LLC

ALLIED UNIVERSAL SECURITY SERVICES DBA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RYAN RUDD

RAVIN SAHADEO

Defendant Attorney

KATHY ARLINE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Production of Non-Party

Notice of Production of Non-Party

Objection

Objection; Comments: TO NON-PARTY PRODUCTION SUBPOENAS

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Production of Non-Party

Notice of Production of Non-Party

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: DEFENDANT DONALD MCNAB

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: ALLIED UNIVERSAL TOPCO LLC

Complaint

Complaint

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Production of Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketObjection; Comments: TO NON-PARTY PRODUCTION SUBPOENAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Production of Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: DEFENDANT DONALD MCNAB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: ALLIED UNIVERSAL TOPCO LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: DONALD PETER MCNAB

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allied Universal Topco, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where US Security Associates Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSAL PROTECTION SERVICE LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Allied Universal Security Services LLC is a litigant