This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 02/13/2021 at 14:41:15 (UTC).

EQUITYMAX INCvs.MB TRANSPORTATION DESTINATIONS LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 03/19/2020 EQUITYMAX INCvs MB TRANSPORTATION DESTINATIONS LLC was filed as a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Kevin B. Weiss and Denise Kim Beamer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************37-O

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Kevin B. Weiss

Denise Kim Beamer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EQUITYMAX INC

Defendants

MICHAEL COBY RYAN BERRY

MB TRANSPORTATION DESTINATIONS LLC

UNKNOWN TENANT

PEPPERTREE CIVIC ASSOCIATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEVEN GREENFIELD

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

Answer

Answer 69738682; Comments: JANIS CARNEY

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: MB TRANSPORTATION DESTINATIONS, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: MICHAEL COBY RYAN BERRY, AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL CLAY BERRY

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: PEPPERTREE CIVIC ASSOCIATION, INC

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Complaint

Complaint

Lis Pendens

Lis Pendens

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer; Comments: JANIS CARNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: MB TRANSPORTATION DESTINATIONS, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: MICHAEL COBY RYAN BERRY, AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL CLAY BERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: PEPPERTREE CIVIC ASSOCIATION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: Unable to Issue Summons - No Return of Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: GREENFIELD, STEVEN BRIAN; Amount: -40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Steven B. Greenfield; Amount: -945.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 945.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Equitymax Inc Pension Plan is a litigant