This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 12/20/2021 at 15:43:51 (UTC).

ENCLAVE AT HIAWASSEE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INCvs.MARIA T BARNES ALLEN, ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY AND THROUGH UNDER

Case Summary

On 10/21/2021 ENCLAVE AT HIAWASSEE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INCvs MARIA T BARNES ALLEN, ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY AND THROUGH UNDER was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian F Duckworth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************68-O

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brian F Duckworth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ENCLAVE AT HIAWASSEE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants

MARIA T BARNES ALLEN

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARIA T BARNES ALLEN

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY AND THROUGH UNDER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TENNILLE SHIPWASH

 

Court Documents

Summons Returned Unserved

Summons Returned Unserved; Comments: Unserved/Unknown Unknown Tenant #2

Summons Returned Unserved

Summons Returned Unserved; Comments: UNKNOWN TENANT #1

Summons Returned Unserved

Summons Returned Unserved; Comments: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARIA T BARNES ALLEN

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: MARIA T BARNES ALLEN

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Comments: PLTF

Notice of Dropping Parties

Notice of Dropping Parties

Correspondence

Correspondence

Correspondence

Correspondence

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: PLTF FILING VERIFICATION OF DEBT AND PAYMENT FORM MAILED TO DEFT

Answer

Answer

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s); Comments: E

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s); Comments: D

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s); Comments: C

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s); Comments: B

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s); Comments: A

Answer

Answer; Comments: sent to Judge

Form "A"

Form "A"

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: form A (no attachment)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved; Comments: Unserved/Unknown Unknown Tenant #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved; Comments: UNKNOWN TENANT #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved; Comments: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARIA T BARNES ALLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: MARIA T BARNES ALLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Dropping Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses; Comments: PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Dropping Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: PLTF FILING VERIFICATION OF DEBT AND PAYMENT FORM MAILED TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Tennille Shipwash; Amount: -340.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 340.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENCLAVE AT HIAWASSEE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shipwash, Tennille M