This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 03/14/2022 at 15:56:51 (UTC).

EMERY MEDICAL SOLUTIONS INCvs.PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INS

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 EMERY MEDICAL SOLUTIONS INCvs PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY, PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INS was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy J Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************71-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Amy J Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EMERY MEDICAL SOLUTIONS INC

NATHAN MCARCHMAN AAO

Defendants

PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM ENGLAND

Defendant Attorney

TIFFANY COLBERT

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Correspondence

Correspondence

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-03

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed atty

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Chad A. Barr; Amount: -75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-03

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE BAYSIDE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SOUTHEASTERN INSURANCE COMAPNY is a litigant

Latest cases where EMERY MEDICAL SOLUTIONS INC is a litigant