This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 10/17/2020 at 01:16:57 (UTC).

EMERY MEDICAL SOLUTIONS INC vs. SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 EMERY MEDICAL SOLUTIONS INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth J Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************16-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth J Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EMERY MEDICAL SOLUTIONS INC

LEONEL VILLEDA CHAVEZ AAO

Defendant

SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAD BARR

 

Court Documents

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: ADDENDUM

Letter

Letter

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Chad Barr; Amount: -65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Comments: ADDENDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less