This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 03/11/2019 at 15:38:15 (UTC).

EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS OF CENTRAL FLORIDA vs. USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/10/2019 EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS OF CENTRAL FLORIDA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth J Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************06-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth J Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS OF CENTRAL FLORIDA

Defendant

USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

ROBERT BARTELS

 

Court Documents

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Summary of Proceedings

Summary of Proceedings

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: PROOF OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND ORIGINAL SUMMONS

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Complaint

Complaint

Letter

Letter

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summary of Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • HEARING - Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Comments: PROOF OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND ORIGINAL SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Appear Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: BradfordCederberg, PA; Amount: -90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 90.00

    Read MoreRead Less