Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 01/28/2019 at 15:49:26 (UTC).

EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS INC vs. USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/29/2018 EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Martha C Adams and Elizabeth J Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************10-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Martha C Adams

Elizabeth J Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BILLY FENELON AKA

EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS INC

Defendant

USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMANDA REHER

Defendant Attorney

ANANTA RAMPERSAD

 

Court Documents

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Complaint

Complaint

Letter

Letter; Comments: DATED 11/29/18 FROM BRADFORD CEDERBERG REGARDING CLAIM

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • HEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Not of App/Cancellation Small Claims PT Conf/Med

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Process/Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter; Comments: DATED 11/29/18 FROM BRADFORD CEDERBERG REGARDING CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: BradfordCederberg, PA; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Emergency Physicians Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rampersad, Ananta