This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 01/27/2019 at 15:54:24 (UTC).

EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS INC vs. UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric H DuBois. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************09-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Eric H DuBois

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BONNIE MOSLEY AKA

EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS INC

Defendant

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARK CEDERBERG

Defendant Attorney

LAUREN OWENS

 

Court Documents

Order Enlargement and Extension of Time

Order Enlargement and Extension of Time

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: SUPREME COURT OF FLORIDA OPINION

Summary of Proceedings

Summary of Proceedings

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT by UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: email to atty

Complaint

Complaint

Letter

Letter; Comments: dated 11/28/18 from bradford cederberg regarding claim

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Enlargement and Extension of Time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Comments: SUPREME COURT OF FLORIDA OPINION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summary of Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • HEARING - Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT by UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Process/Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: email to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter; Comments: dated 11/28/18 from bradford cederberg regarding claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: BradfordCederberg, PA; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less