This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 04/07/2023 at 16:28:33 (UTC).

EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS INC vs. GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/06/2023 EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian Sandor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************13-O

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brian Sandor

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS INC

JAMES MITCHELL AAO

EMERGENCY RESOURCES GROUP DBA

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEVEN DELL

Defendant Attorney

DOMENICO TIRADO

 

Court Documents

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Change

Notice of Change; Comments: OF LAW FIRM AND ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND DIRECTIONS TO THE CLERK

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Motion for Default

Motion for Default

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change; Comments: OF LAW FIRM AND ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND DIRECTIONS TO THE CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: DELL, STEVEN GERARD; Amount: -185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less