This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 02/22/2022 at 12:43:01 (UTC).

EMBARQ FLORIDA INC vs.HDD OF FLORIDA LLC

Case Summary

On 08/03/2021 EMBARQ FLORIDA INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HDD OF FLORIDA LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Carly S Wish. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************95-O

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Carly S Wish

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EMBARQ FLORIDA INC

CENTURYLINK DBA

Defendant

HDD OF FLORIDA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMAS MACCARI

Defendant Attorney

ARMAND CORTELLESSO

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed to attorney

Answer

Answer; Comments: to complaint

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Notice

Notice; Comments: of disclosure

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: HDD OF FLORIDA LLC

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Order

Order; Comments: following pretrial conference

Order Enlargement and Extension of Time

Order Enlargement and Extension of Time

Order Enlargement and Extension of Time

Order Enlargement and Extension of Time

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Enlargement and Extension of Time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Enlargement and Extension of Time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Comments: following pretrial conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Civil - Pulayya, Juna (Actual: Pulayya, Juna); Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Civil - Pulayya, Juna (Actual: Pulayya, Juna)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: HDD OF FLORIDA LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer; Comments: to complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Thomas J. Maccari PA; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Embarq Florida Inc dba CenturyLink is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTURYLINK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARMAND CORTELLESSO