This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 02/19/2022 at 14:50:59 (UTC).

EMBARQ FLORIDA INC vs.ATLANTIC CIVIL CONSTRUCTORS CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 04/29/2021 EMBARQ FLORIDA INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ATLANTIC CIVIL CONSTRUCTORS CORPORATION. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael Deen and Eric H DuBois. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************74-O

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Michael Deen

Eric H DuBois

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EMBARQ FLORIDA INC

CENTURYLINK DBA

Defendant

ATLANTIC CIVIL CONSTRUCTORS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMAS MACCARI

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Notice to Appear

Notice to Appear; Comments: emailed to atty

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: ATLANTIC CIVIL CONSTRUCTIORS CORPORATION

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2021
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil - Pulayya, Juna; Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil - Pulayya, Juna

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: ATLANTIC CIVIL CONSTRUCTIORS CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Thomas J. Maccari PA; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ATLANTIC CIVIL CONSTRUCTORS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Embarq Florida Inc dba CenturyLink is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMAS JEFFREY MACCARI