This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 01/14/2019 at 15:50:10 (UTC).

EAST LAKE CHIROPRACTIC AND INJURY CENTER INC vs. GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/15/2018 EAST LAKE CHIROPRACTIC AND INJURY CENTER INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Faye L Allen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************71-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Faye L Allen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KRISTOPHER COLON AKA

EAST LAKE CHIROPRACTIC AND INJURY CENTER INC

KRISTOPHER COLON AAO

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TODD LANDAU

 

Court Documents

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Summary of Proceedings

Summary of Proceedings

Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Change of Address

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: (SUPPLEMENTAL)

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: (SUPPLEMENTAL)

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: (SUPPLEMENTAL) REGARDING RELATEDNESS AND MEDICAL NECESSITY

Supplemental Interrogatories

Supplemental Interrogatories; Comments: regarding worker's compensation

Supplemental Interrogatories

Supplemental Interrogatories; Comments: regarding sports related injury

Supplemental Interrogatories

Supplemental Interrogatories; Comments: regarding relatedness and medical necessity

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: plaintiff's supplemental

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: plaintiff's supplemental

Supplemental Interrogatories

Supplemental Interrogatories; Comments: to defendant regarding underwriting and policy forms

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: (supplemental) regarding underwriting

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: (plaintiff's supplemental) regarding fee schedule

Motion for Summary Judgment

Motion for Summary Judgment; Comments: as to the application of so called statutory fee schedules at fla.stat. 627.36(5)(a)(2)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summary of Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • HEARING - Pre-Trial Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce; Comments: (SUPPLEMENTAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce; Comments: (SUPPLEMENTAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce; Comments: (SUPPLEMENTAL) REGARDING RELATEDNESS AND MEDICAL NECESSITY

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Appear Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Landau & Associates, P.A.; Amount: -90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 90.00

    Read MoreRead Less