This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/03/2019 at 15:33:43 (UTC).

EAGLE HOME MORTGAGE LLC vs. PERALTA, WILLIE NARANJOet al.

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 EAGLE HOME MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against PERALTA, WILLIE NARANJO. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Kevin B. Weiss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************83-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Kevin B. Weiss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EAGLE HOME MORTGAGE LLC

Defendants

FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES

UNKNOWN TENANT

FORESTWOOD PLACE HOME OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

ANNETTE NARANJO

WILLIE NARANJO PERALTA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EMILIO LENZI

 

Court Documents

Answer

Answer; Comments: TO COMPLAINT

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: WILLIE

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Lis Pendens

Lis Pendens

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: ANNETTE

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORP

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Value of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

Value of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

Complaint

Complaint

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: FORESTWOOD PLACE HOME OWNERS ASSOC INC

Certificate

Certificate; Comments: OF ORIGINAL NOTE POSSESSION

Summons Returned Unserved

Summons Returned Unserved; Comments: UKN TENANT

Notice of Dropping Parties

Notice of Dropping Parties

Form "A"

Form "A"

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Dropping Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Dropping Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer; Comments: TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned Unserved; Comments: UKN TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned Served; Comments: FORESTWOOD PLACE HOME OWNERS ASSOC INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned Served; Comments: FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned Served; Comments: ANNETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned Served; Comments: WILLIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate; Comments: OF ORIGINAL NOTE POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Value of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Lis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Form "A"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Promissory Note

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Phelan Hallinan Diamond & Jones, PLLC; Amount: -957.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 957.50

    Read MoreRead Less