Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 06/01/2021 at 15:03:23 (UTC).

DRUMMOND LIVING TRUSTet al. vs. ROSARIO, JESUSet al.

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 DRUMMOND LIVING TRUST filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROSARIO, JESUS. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey L Ashton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************14-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Jeffrey L Ashton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GLENN I DRUMMOND

ALMA S DRUMMOND

DRUMMOND LIVING TRUST

Defendants

JESUS ROSARIO

CENTER STATE TRANSPORTATION INC

MTC ORLANDO LLC

MOTOR TREND ORLANDO SERVICE LLC

JAY ROSARIO AKA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL FRIED

Defendant Attorneys

BRETT RENTON

SCOTT SIVERSON

 

Court Documents

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint

Motion for Case Management Conference

Motion for Case Management Conference

Motion to Amend

Motion to Amend; Comments: complaint and to add party

Mediation Report

Mediation Report

Opposition

Opposition; Comments: TO MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND MOTION TO DISMISS FOR WANT OF STANDING AND FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM WITH MEMORANDUM OF LAW

Motion for Final Judgment

Motion for Final Judgment; Comments: AND TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COUNT I OF THE COMPLAINT- FILED BY PLTF, GLENN I. AND ALMA S. DRUMMOND/ DRUMMOND LIVING TRUST

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: MOTOR TREND ORLANDO SERVICE, LLC

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AS TO COUNT I EVICTION ONLY

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Issued 5 Day

Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Issued 5 Day

Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Issued 5 Day

Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: emailed atty

Complaint

Complaint

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcceptance of Service; Comments: and waiver of formal service of process of the amended complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Denying; Comments: motion to amend and motion for judgment. Granting motion to amend to adding additional proposed individuals

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter; Comments: COVER LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • HearingHearing: Motion - Ashton, Jeffrey L (Actual: Ashton, Jeffrey L); Location: Hearing Room 1100.01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketHEARING - Motion - Ashton, Jeffrey L (Actual: Ashton, Jeffrey L)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comments: on March 25, 2021, at 9:45 a.m. via telephone conference

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued 5 Day; Comments: emailed atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued 5 Day; Comments: emailed atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued 5 Day; Comments: emailed atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued 5 Day; Comments: emailed atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: 20 Day Summons Not Issued - 20 day summons will require service address to be included in the summons where the defendant will be served.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Michael Fried; Amount: -460.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 460.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MTC ORLANDO, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fried, Michael