Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 04/05/2021 at 15:54:08 (UTC).

DOCTORS PAIN MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES LLC vs. USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/04/2021 DOCTORS PAIN MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Tina L Caraballo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************46-O

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Tina L Caraballo

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DOCTORS PAIN MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES LLC

MAR RODRIGUEZ AAO

Defendant

USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY GUDIN

Defendant Attorney

BETH GORDON

 

Court Documents

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: to respond to the complaint

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Service

Notice of Service; Comments: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: em atty

Addendum to

Addendum to

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim; Comments: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: to respond to the complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service; Comments: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: em atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Marc Salpeter; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Comments: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DOCTORS PAIN MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where USAA Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BETH GORDON